Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Martínez y Vigil, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1840Born
30 May 186322.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Jan 186423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Mar 188443.5SelectedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
27 Mar 188443.5ConfirmedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
1 Jun 188443.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oviedo, Spain
16 Aug 190463.9DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramón Martínez y Vigil (VIAF: 72216927)
Bishop Ramón Martínez y Vigil O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta María de Tiñana, Diocese of Oviedo
Ordained BishopSan Isidro, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 431
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,968
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017