Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodrigo Moreno Echevarría y Briones, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1790Born
4 Sep 185767.3SelectedBishop of Segovia, Spain
25 Sep 185767.4ConfirmedBishop of Segovia, Spain
13 Dec 185767.6Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
27 Dec 185767.6InstalledBishop of Segovia, Spain
21 Dec 187585.6DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Rodrigo Moreno Echevarría y Briones
Bishop Rodrigo Moreno Echevarría y Briones O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Millán de la Cogolla
Ordained BishopSan Martin, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 509
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 164, Number 901
  • c2: CB, 28 Oct 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast