Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renato Marangoni

Bishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1958 Born
4 Jun 198325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
10 Feb 201657.7AppointedBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
10 Apr 201657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy
24 Apr 201657.9InstalledBishop of Belluno-Feltre, Italy

MicroData Summary for Renato Marangoni
Bishop Renato Marangoni (born ) Bishop of Belluno-Feltre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCrespano del Grappa, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopCattedrale di Santa Maria Assunta, Basilica, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belluno-Feltre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 24 Feb 2016
  • c23: CB, 26 Feb 2016
  • c4: CB, 31 Mar 2016
  • c35: CB, 10 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,893

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017