Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Cipolla

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1955 Born
16 Dec 197823.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mantova, Italy
24 May 198025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mantova, Italy
18 Jul 201560.4AppointedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
27 Sep 201560.6Ordained BishopBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
18 Oct 201560.6InstalledBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Claudio Cipolla
Bishop Claudio Cipolla (born ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoito

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Padova {Padua}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2015
  • ob/i: CB, 22 Jul 2015
  • c2: CB, 19 Sep 2015
  • c3+: CB, 27 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017