Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damián Gustavo Nannini

Bishop of San Miguel, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1961 Born
15 Dec 198928.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rosario, Argentina
7 Nov 201857.1AppointedBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
14 Dec 201857.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Miguel, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Damián Gustavo Nannini
Bishop Damián Gustavo Nannini (born ) Bishop of San Miguel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosario, Archdiocese of Rosario
Ordained BishopSan Miguel Arcángel, Cathedral, San Miguel, Diocese of San Miguel

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Miguel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2018
  • c1: CB, 7 Nov 2018
  • ob: CB, 13 Nov 2018
  • c2+: CB, 4 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast