Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Ioan Boroş (Borosiu)

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Thespiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1850BornCarei
187726.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 192372.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thespiae
12 Jan 193786.2DiedBishop-Elect of Thespiae

MicroData Summary for Ioan Boroş (Borosiu):
Priest Ioan Boroş (Borosiu) (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Thespiae

  • a priest for 60.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013