Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elias Hranilović

Deceased

Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1850BornSošice
24 Apr 187524.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Apr 187524.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 188232.2SelectedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
15 Mar 188332.4ConfirmedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
22 Apr 188332.5Ordained BishopBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia
20 Mar 188938.4DiedBishop of Križevci (Kreutz) (Križevci), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Elias Hranilović
Bishop Elias Hranilović (born , died ) Bishop of Križevci (Kreutz)

  • a priest for 13.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 231
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,792
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 7,622

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016