Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Maurice des Landes d’Aussac de Saint Palais

Deceased

Bishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1811Born
28 May 183624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
3 Oct 184836.8AppointedBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
14 Jan 184937.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA
28 Jun 187765.6DiedBishop of Vincennes, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Maurice des Landes d’Aussac de Saint Palais (VIAF: 304725151)
Bishop Jacques-Maurice des Landes d’Aussac de Saint Palais (born , died ) Bishop of Vincennes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Salvetat, Diocese of Montpellier, France
Ordained PriestSaint-Sulpice, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vincennes, Diocese of Vincennes, Indiana

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 592
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Feb 2017