Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Mary (Michael) Fink, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Leavenworth, Kansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1834BornTriftersberg, Bavaria, Germany
6 Jan 185419.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
28 May 185722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 Mar 187136.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Kansas, USA
1 Mar 187136.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
11 Jun 187136.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eucarpia
18 Nov 187440.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Kansas, USA
22 May 187742.9AppointedBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
17 Mar 190469.7DiedBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Mary (Michael) Fink:
Bishop Louis Mary (Michael) Fink O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Leavenworth

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 263, and Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013