Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Cunningham

Deceased

Bishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1842Born
8 Aug 186523.1Ordained PriestPriest of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
14 May 189855.9AppointedBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
21 Sep 189856.2Ordained BishopBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA
23 Jun 191977.0DiedBishop of Concordia, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Francis Cunningham
Bishop John Francis Cunningham (born , died ) Bishop of Concordia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrremore, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Leavenworth, Diocese of Leavenworth, Kansas

  • a priest for 53.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 222
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017