Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Darío Rubén Quintana Muñiz, O.A.R.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Mar del Plata, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Bavagaliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1971 Born
28 Aug 199322.5Simple VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
31 Oct 199625.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Augustinian Recollects
17 May 199726.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
5 Nov 201948.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
5 Nov 201948.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
28 Dec 201948.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana

MicroData Summary for Darío Rubén Quintana Muñiz
Father Darío Rubén Quintana Muñiz O.A.R. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Mar del Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained DeaconBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained PriestNuestra Señora de la Consolación, Church, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mar del Plata, Diocese of Mar del Plata

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Mar del Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2019
  • simp/od/c012: CB, 5 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 6 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 7 Nov 2019

Quantcast