Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Alberto Puiggari

Archbishop of Paraná, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1949 Born
13 Nov 197626.9Ordained PriestPriest of Paraná, Argentina
20 Feb 199848.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraná, Argentina
20 Feb 199848.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuzi
8 May 199848.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuzi
7 Jun 200353.5AppointedBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
10 Aug 200353.7InstalledBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
4 Nov 201060.9AppointedArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
7 Mar 201161.2InstalledArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Alberto Puiggari
Archbishop Juan Alberto Puiggari (born ) Archbishop of Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Paraná.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017