Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sinforiano Lucas Rojo, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pilcomayo

Titular Bishop of Boreum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1905BornHacias, Spain
23 Feb 192923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
24 Aug 196257.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo, Paraguay
24 Aug 196257.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Boreum
7 Oct 196257.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Boreum
24 Jan 198175.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo, Paraguay
4 May 199084.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pilcomayo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Sinforiano Lucas Rojo:
Bishop Sinforiano Lucas Rojo O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pilcomayo

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013