Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Shaw, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo, Paraguay

Titular Bishop of Crepedula


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1925Born
30 Sep 195126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
22 Apr 198155.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo, Paraguay
22 Apr 198155.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Crepedula
22 Apr 198155.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Crepedula
21 Jun 198458.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Pedro Shaw
Bishop Pedro Shaw O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWilrijk, Belgium
Ordained BishopMariscal Estigarribia

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 66, Number 5,196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast