Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucio Alfert, O.M.I.

Vicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo

Titular Bishop of Tubyza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1941 BornHeek, Germany
17 Feb 197230.2ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Apr 197230.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
24 Jan 198644.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo, Paraguay
24 Jan 198644.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubyza
21 May 198644.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubyza

MicroData Summary for Lucio Alfert:
Bishop Lucio Alfert O.M.I. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Pilcomayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,236

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013