Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James J. Roche

Deceased

Bishop of Cloyne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1870BornMiddleton
29 Oct 189323.0Ordained PriestPriest
31 Mar 192655.4AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
30 May 192655.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
26 Jun 193160.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cloyne, Ireland
26 Jun 193160.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sebastopolis in Armenia
23 Mar 193564.4SucceededBishop of Cloyne, Ireland
31 Aug 195685.9DiedBishop of Cloyne, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James J. Roche:
Bishop James J. Roche (born , died ) Bishop of Cloyne

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013