Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Flanagan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Antonio, Texas, USA

Titular Bishop of Bavagaliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1930Born
10 Jun 195625.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Antonio, Texas, USA
5 Jan 199867.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
5 Jan 199867.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
16 Feb 199867.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bavagaliana
15 Dec 200575.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of San Antonio, Texas, USA
9 Oct 201988.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Antonio, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Flanagan
Bishop Thomas Joseph Flanagan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of San Antonio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRathmore, Ireland
Ordained BishopMunicipal Auditorium, San Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas
Death PlaceSan Antonio, Archdiocese of San Antonio, Texas

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,241
  • d: CB, 9 Oct 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast