Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wendelin Joseph Nold

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1900Born
11 Apr 192525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Dallas, Texas, USA
29 Nov 194747.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
29 Nov 194747.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasima
25 Feb 194848.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasima
1 Apr 195050.2SucceededBishop of Galveston, Texas, USA
22 Apr 197575.2RetiredBishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
1 Oct 198181.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Wendelin Joseph Nold
Bishop Wendelin Joseph Nold (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galveston-Houston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonham

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017