Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Silvestre Luís Scandián, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1931Born
3 Aug 195826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
4 Jan 197543.0AppointedBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Feb 197543.1Ordained BishopBishop of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 Aug 198149.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
27 Apr 198452.3SucceededArchbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
14 Apr 200472.2ResignedArchbishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
16 Feb 201987.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Silvestre Luís Scandián
Archbishop Silvestre Luís Scandián S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vitória

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIconha
Death PlaceJuiz de Fora, Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 60.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 16 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 16 Feb 2019

Quantcast