Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Marquez, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1952 BornLucerna
22 Feb 197623.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Jan 198027.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Nov 198028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
31 May 200653.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
31 May 200653.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
6 Aug 200653.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
22 Dec 201058.1AppointedBishop of Joaçaba, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário Marquez:
Bishop Mário Marquez O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Joaçaba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Joaçaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,217
  • c0: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013