Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ailton Menegussi

Bishop of Crateús, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1962 BornNova Venécia
22 Nov 199836.0Ordained PriestPriest of São Mateus, Espirito Santo, Brazil
6 Nov 201351.0AppointedBishop of Crateús, Ceara, Brazil
21 Dec 201351.1Ordained BishopBishop of Crateús, Ceara, Brazil
4 Jan 201451.2InstalledBishop of Crateús, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ailton Menegussi:
Bishop Ailton Menegussi (born ) Bishop of Crateús

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Crateús.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2013
  • ob/c2+/i: CB, 6 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 6 Nov 2013