Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Felice Tiberi, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1763Born
23 Dec 178623.1Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 180642.7ProfessedPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
20 Mar 181854.4SelectedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
6 Apr 181854.4ConfirmedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
12 Apr 181854.4Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
22 Apr 1829³65.5DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Felice Tiberi
Bishop Francesco Felice Tiberi C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVasto

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1818, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast