Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Durini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1759BornChieti
6 Mar 178424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
22 May 181858.4SelectedBishop of Marsi, Italy
21 Dec 181859.0ConfirmedBishop of Marsi, Italy
27 Dec 181859.0Ordained BishopBishop of Marsi, Italy
20 Jun 182363.5SelectedBishop of Aversa, Italy
17 Nov 182363.9ConfirmedBishop of Aversa, Italy
15 Jan 184484.1DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Durini
Bishop Francesco Saverio Durini O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 100, and Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 91

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016