Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Novi Ciavarria

Deceased

Bishop of Avellino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1764BornNapoli
20 Dec 178824.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181853.3SelectedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
6 Apr 181853.3ConfirmedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
12 Apr 181853.3Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
4 May 184176.4DiedBishop of Avellino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Novi Ciavarria
Bishop Domenico Novi Ciavarria (born , died ) Bishop of Avellino

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 99
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1818, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 May 2016