Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Carafa, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1717BornNolan
19 Mar 173316.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
23 May 173922.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
25 Mar 174124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
22 Jul 175437.3AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
25 Jul 175437.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
19 Jul 175639.3AppointedBishop of Mileto, Italy
10 Feb 178567.9ResignedBishop of Mileto, Italy
7 Sep 178669.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Mileto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Carafa:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Carafa C.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mileto

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 288, and Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1754, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015