Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Lettieri

Deceased

Bishop of Nard˛


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1780BornFoggia
17 Dec 180323.5Ordained PriestPriest
20 Mar 181837.7SelectedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
6 Apr 181837.8ConfirmedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
12 Apr 181837.8Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
13 Mar 182544.7SelectedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
27 Jun 182545.0ConfirmedBishop of Nard˛, Italy
6 Oct 183959.3DiedBishop of Nard˛, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Lettieri
Bishop Salvatore Lettieri (born , died ) Bishop of Nard˛

  • a priest for 35.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 139, and Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1818, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 5 May 2016