Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Maria de Luca, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1754BornPonticelli
20 Sep 177723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Mar 181863.6SelectedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
6 Apr 181863.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
12 Apr 181863.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
19 Feb 183479.5AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy
13 Jan 183984.4DiedArchbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona), Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria de Luca
Archbishop Francesco Maria de Luca O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano (e Ortona)

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1818, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016