Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cassiodoro Margarita

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1774BornNapoli
16 Feb 179924.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 181844.4SelectedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
21 Dec 181844.4ConfirmedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
27 Dec 181844.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
1 Sep 185076.1DiedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

MicroData Summary for Cassiodoro Margarita
Bishop Cassiodoro Margarita (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1818, Number 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 May 2016