Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Massa, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1895Born
191418.5ProfessedMember of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
26 Mar 192125.7Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
29 Mar 193842.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nanyang [Nanyang], China
29 Mar 193842.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Citharizum
26 May 193842.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citharizum
11 Apr 194650.8AppointedBishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China
19 Feb 197882.6DiedBishop of Nanyang [Nanyang], China

MicroData Summary for Pietro Massa
Bishop Pietro Massa P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Nanyang [Nanyang]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained BishopKiuhiaking

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 41
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 4 Apr 2020

Quantcast