Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Quiché

Dioecesis Quicensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Santa Cruz del Quiché
27 April 1967ErectedDiocese of Sololá Diocese of Santa Cruz del Quiché (erected)
13 February 1996Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Santa Cruz del Quiché (from Guatemala)
Diocese of Quiché
11 July 2000Name ChangedDiocese of Santa Cruz del Quiché Diocese of Quiché

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Santa Cruz del Quiché
1970240,000247,77596.9%25259,600262820ap1971
1976285,570300,64195.0%2202212,980202722ap1977
1980297,600314,00094.8%3121519,840123422ap1981
1990356,000445,00080.0%1181918,736154925ap1991
1999453,862567,32780.0%1892716,809158424ap2000
Diocese of Quiché
2000466,000581,51080.1%2182916,068178124ap2001
2001472,186590,23380.0%2193015,739178124ap2002
2002483,990604,98880.0%2473115,612118124ap2003
2003491,250614,06380.0%2283016,375118523ap2004
2004524,408655,51080.0%2383116,916128523ap2005
2010503,000714,00070.4%2683414,794128326ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 22 Nov 2013