Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianni Sacchi

Bishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1960 Born
28 Apr 199029.6Ordained PriestPriest of Biella, Italy
31 Jul 201756.8AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
21 Oct 201757.0Ordained BishopBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
29 Oct 201757.1InstalledBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gianni Sacchi
Bishop Gianni Sacchi (born ) Bishop of Casale Monferrato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrivero, Diocese of Biella
Ordained PriestSanto Stefano, Cathedral, Biella, Diocese of Biella
Ordained BishopSanto Stefano, Cathedral, Biella, Diocese of Biella

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Casale Monferrato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2017
  • ob/i: CB, 2 Aug 2017
  • c2+: CB, 4 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 15 Dec 2017