Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michele Cardinal Pellegrino

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Ges¨


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1903BornCentallo
19 Sep 192522.4Ordained PriestPriest of Fossano, Italy
18 Sep 196562.3AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
17 Oct 196562.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
26 Jun 196764.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196764.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Nome di Ges¨
27 Jul 197774.2RetiredArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
10 Oct 198683.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Pellegrino:
Michele Cardinal Pellegrino (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
  • a cardinal for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015