Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Farinella

Bishop of Biella, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1968 Born
24 Sep 199426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Ivrea, Italy
27 Jul 201850.1AppointedBishop of Biella, Italy
29 Sep 201850.3Ordained BishopBishop of Biella, Italy
14 Oct 201850.3InstalledBishop of Biella, Italy

MicroData Summary for Roberto Farinella
Bishop Roberto Farinella (born ) Bishop of Biella

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellamonte, Diocese of Ivrea
Ordained PriestChurch, Castellamonte, Diocese of Ivrea
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ivrea, Diocese of Ivrea

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Biella.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 31 Jul 2018
  • c1/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018
  • c2+: CB, 15 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 30 Sep 2018

Quantcast