Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marco Arnolfo

Archbishop of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1952 Born
25 Jun 197825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
27 Feb 201461.2AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
11 May 201461.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Arnolfo
Archbishop Marco Arnolfo (born ) Archbishop of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCavallermaggiore

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Vercelli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 6 Mar 2014
  • c2+: CB, 19 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,157

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast