Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Louis Bruguès, O.P.

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

Librarian of the Vatican Library


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1943 BornBagnères de Bigorre
29 Sep 196925.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Jun 197531.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Mar 200056.3AppointedBishop of Angers, France
30 Apr 200056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
10 Nov 200764.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Catholic Education (for Institutes of Study)
10 Nov 200764.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title)
26 Jun 201268.6AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
26 Jun 201268.6AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
28 Feb 201369.3CeasedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
28 Feb 201369.3CeasedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
16 Mar 201369.3ConfirmedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
16 Mar 201369.3ConfirmedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Jean-Louis Bruguès:
Archbishop Jean-Louis Bruguès O.P. (born ) Archivist of Vatican Secret Archives

Please contact the Archbishop through the Vatican Secret Archives.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,754
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013