Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gilbert Marie Michel Méranville

Archbishop Emeritus of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1936 Born
20 Dec 195923.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
14 Nov 200367.7AppointedArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
18 Apr 200468.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles
7 Mar 201579.0RetiredArchbishop of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre), Martinique, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Marie Michel Méranville
Archbishop Gilbert Marie Michel Méranville (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVauclin

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Fort-de-France (e Saint Pierre).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,575
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Aug 2017