Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hubert Constant, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1931BornCamp-Perrin
15 Sep 195827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
31 Jan 199159.4AppointedBishop of Fort-Liberté, Haïti
7 Apr 199159.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fort-Liberté, Haïti
5 Nov 200372.1AppointedArchbishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
1 Mar 200876.5RetiredArchbishop of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti
23 Sep 201180.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien, Haïti

MicroData Summary for Hubert Constant:
Archbishop Hubert Constant O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cap-Haïtien

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,395
  • d: L'Osservatore Romano (Italian), 24 Sep 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 22 Feb 2014