Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Iório Rodrigues

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1929BornMaceio
30 Nov 195324.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 198555.7AppointedBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
29 May 198555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
12 Jul 200677.1RetiredBishop of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
20 Mar 201080.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Fernando Iório Rodrigues:
Bishop Fernando Iório Rodrigues (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palmeira dos Índios

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2006
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013