Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valfredo Bernardo Tepe, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1918Born
30 May 194224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Feb 196748.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
13 Feb 196748.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
30 May 196749.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
14 Jan 197152.7AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
5 Jul 199577.1RetiredBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
14 Feb 200384.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Valfredo Bernardo Tepe
Bishop Valfredo Bernardo Tepe O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ilhéus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünster, Germany

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast