Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Louis Péchenard

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1842BornGespunsart
1868¹25.1Ordained PriestPriest of Reims, France
13 Jan 190764.1AppointedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
31 Jan 190764.2Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France
27 May 192077.5DiedBishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Louis Péchenard:
Bishop Pierre-Louis Péchenard (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons (-Laon-Saint-Quentin)

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013