Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Jean Gely

Deceased

Bishop of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1849BornRigols
7 Jun 187324.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 190657.0AppointedBishop of Mende, France
25 Feb 190657.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
29 May 192980.3DiedBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Jean Gely:
Bishop Jacques-Jean Gely (born , died ) Bishop of Mende

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013