Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alcime-Armand-Pierre-Marie Gouraud

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1856BornVieillevigne
29 Jun 188024.2Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 190649.8AppointedBishop of Vannes, France
25 Feb 190649.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
2 Oct 192872.4DiedBishop of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Alcime-Armand-Pierre-Marie Gouraud:
Bishop Alcime-Armand-Pierre-Marie Gouraud (born , died ) Bishop of Vannes

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015