Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François Richer dit Laflèche

Deceased

Bishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1818Born
7 Jan 184425.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Nov 186648.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
23 Nov 186648.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
25 Feb 186748.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
30 Apr 187051.6SucceededBishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
14 Jul 189879.8DiedBishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Louis-François Richer dit Laflèche (VIAF: 24728807)
Bishop Louis-François Richer dit Laflèche (born , died ) Bishop of Trois-Rivières

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSte-Anne-de-la-Pérade
Ordained BishopTrois Rivières, Diocese of Trois-Rivières, Québec

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105, and Page 566
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Jun 2018

Quantcast