Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elphège Gravel

Deceased

Bishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1838Born
11 Oct 187031.9Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 188546.7AppointedBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
2 Aug 188546.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada
28 Jan 190465.2DiedBishop of Nicolet, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Elphège Gravel (VIAF: 68461752)
Bishop Elphège Gravel (born , died ) Bishop of Nicolet

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt-Antoine sur le Richelieu, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopSte Agathe des Irlandais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 412
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,314
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 19 Sep 2017