Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Maria Carli

Deceased

Archbishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1914Born
20 Jun 193722.5Ordained PriestPriest of Comacchio, Italy
31 Jul 195742.6AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
21 Sep 195742.8Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
26 Jan 197358.1AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
14 Apr 198671.4DiedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Maria Carli (VIAF: 263872604)
Archbishop Luigi Maria Carli (born , died ) Archbishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComacchio, Diocese of Comacchio
Ordained BishopSan Cassiano, Cathedral, Comacchio, Diocese of Comacchio

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast