Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Suburbicarian See of Velletri-Segni

Veliternus-Signinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vincenzo Apicella, Bishop
  • Andrea Maria Erba, B., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Suburbicarian See
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Diocese of Roma {Rome}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 397 (153 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Lazio
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.velletri-segni.it/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Vescovile, Corso della Repubblica 343, 00049 Velletri [Roma], Italia
  • Telephone: 06.963.00.51
  • Fax: 06.961.00.596

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Velletri
5 May 1914SplitSuburbicarian See of Ostia (-Velletri) Suburbicarian See of Ostia
Diocese of Velletri
Suburbicarian See of Velletri e Segni
20 October 1981UnitedDiocese of Segni
Diocese of Velletri
Suburbicarian See of Velletri e Segni
Suburbicarian See of Velletri-Segni
30 September 1986Name ChangedSuburbicarian See of Velletri e Segni Suburbicarian See of Velletri-Segni

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Velletri
194986,00087,00098.9%4518631,365232427ap1951
197052,70053,00099.4%2427511,033561077ap1971
198055,00056,20097.9%2427511,078521029ap1981
Suburbicarian See of Velletri e Segni
Suburbicarian See of Velletri-Segni
1990104,000105,00099.0%4625711,46444619827ap1991
1999117,300118,20099.2%5330831,41394012027ap2000
2000119,100120,17099.1%4733801,488104512227ap2001
2001118,000120,89497.6%5130811,456114723827ap2002
2002118,000121,67497.0%82341161,017115422527ap2003
2003115,800118,50097.7%5728851,362113921827ap2004
2004119,690122,69097.6%6630961,246124422627ap2005
2010127,600135,50094.2%3940791,615114716527ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 2 Sep 2013