Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Vari

Archbishop of Gaeta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1957 Born
13 Sep 198023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Segni, Italy
20 Oct 198124.6IncardinatedPriest of Velletri e Segni, Italy
21 Apr 201659.1AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
21 Jun 201659.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
9 Jul 201659.3InstalledArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Vari
Archbishop Luigi Vari (born ) Archbishop of Gaeta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegni, Diocese of Segni
Ordained BishopCollegiata di Santa Maria Maggiore, Valmontone, Suburbicarian See of Velletri-Segni

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gaeta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Apr 2016
  • c1: CB, 21 Apr 2016
  • ob: CB, 23 Apr 2016
  • c2+: CB, 6 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,946

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast