Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Magennis

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1847Born
1870¹22.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 188840.8AppointedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
15 Apr 188841.0Ordained BishopBishop of Kilmore, Ireland
15 May 190659.1DiedBishop of Kilmore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edward Magennis
Bishop Edward Magennis (born , died ) Bishop of Kilmore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKill
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cavan
Death PlaceCullies House, Cavan

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 329
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017