Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Gaffney

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1839Born
1864¹24.9Ordained PriestPriest of Meath, Ireland
28 Apr 189960.3AppointedBishop of Meath, Ireland
25 Jun 189960.4Ordained BishopBishop of Meath, Ireland
1906¹66.9ResignedBishop of Meath, Ireland
15 Dec 190970.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthew Gaffney
Bishop Matthew Gaffney (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMountnugent, Diocese of Meath
Ordained BishopMeath, Diocese of Meath
Death PlaceMeath, Diocese of Meath

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017