Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Hackett, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1863BornDungarvan
24 Jun 188825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
8 Sep 190542.3ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Jan 191652.7AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
19 Mar 191652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
1 Jun 193269.0DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Bernard Hackett:
Bishop Bernard Hackett C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bp/pr/obp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013